NY A04111 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - print number 4111b
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - print number 4111b
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to computer-based assessment technology apportionment; provides aid for technology purchases beginning in the 2019-2020 school year for school districts and boards of cooperative educational services.
Title
Relates to computer-based assessment technology apportionment; provides aid for technology purchases beginning in the 2019-2020 school year for school districts and boards of cooperative educational services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | Assembly | print number 4111b |
2018-02-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-06-23 | Assembly | print number 4111a |
2017-06-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2017-02-01 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S01691 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - PRINT NUMBER 1691B