NY A04089 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Designates a portion of the state highway system in the town of Montgomery, county of Orange, the "Steve Nicoli Memorial Highway".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates a portion of the state highway system in the town of Montgomery, county of Orange, the "Steve Nicoli Memorial Highway".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-06-03SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-06-03Senate3RD READING CAL.1645
2024-06-03SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6469A
2024-05-30SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2024-05-30Assemblydelivered to senate
2024-05-30Assemblypassed assembly
2024-05-30Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.238
2024-05-30Assemblyrules report cal.238
2024-05-30Assemblyreported
2024-05-28Assemblyreported referred to rules
2024-05-21Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2024-05-03Assemblyprint number 4089a
2024-05-03Assemblyamend and recommit to transportation
2024-01-16Assemblycommitted to transportation
2024-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.114
2024-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2023-06-07SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2023-06-07Assemblydelivered to senate
2023-06-07Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.623
2023-06-07Assemblyrules report cal.623
2023-06-07Assemblyreported
2023-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-05-24Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2023-02-09Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S06469 (Same As) 2024-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4089A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A4089
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04089&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04089
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04089&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04089A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04089&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04089&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04089&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04089&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04089&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC4
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04089&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC5
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04089&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC6
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A4089#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback