NY A04088 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a ten-year state takeover of the local share of Medicaid outside of New York city; provides a twenty-year state takeover of fifty percent of the local share of Medicaid in New York city; creates a commission to reform public assistance benefits; expands the state earned income tax credit from thirty percent to forty-five percent of the federal credit amount; offers the option for individuals to receive the state earned income tax credit in monthly installments; expands the child and dependent care tax credit; allows those receiving unemployment insurance to work part-time while still receiving a partial unemployment benefit; provides for state assumption of the growth in property taxes for school districts and local governments that remain under the real property tax cap; creates a real property tax redesign team required to produce recurring savings; and subjects New York city to the property tax cap.
Title
Relates to a ten-year state takeover of the local share of Medicaid outside of New York city; provides a twenty-year state takeover of fifty percent of the local share of Medicaid in New York city; creates a commission to reform public assistance benefits; expands the state earned income tax credit from thirty percent to forty-five percent of the federal credit amount; offers the option for individuals to receive the state earned income tax credit in monthly installments; expands the child and dependent care tax credit; allows those receiving unemployment insurance to work part-time while still receiving a partial unemployment benefit; provides for state assumption of the growth in property taxes for school districts and local governments that remain under the real property tax cap; creates a real property tax redesign team required to produce recurring savings; and subjects New York city to the property tax cap.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-17 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2019-02-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |