NY A04066 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 74-25)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires motor vehicle dealer franchisors to fully compensate franchised motor vehicle dealers for warranty service agreements.
Title
Requires motor vehicle dealer franchisors to fully compensate franchised motor vehicle dealers for warranty service agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-04-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-04-03 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.459 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5085C |
2024-03-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2024-03-27 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-03-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4066b |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.112 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2023-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.446 |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.446 |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | print number 4066a |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S05085 (Same As) 2024-04-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4066B