NY A04064 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to registered dental assisting; increases the age for registered dental assisting from seventeen to eighteen years of age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to registered dental assisting; increases the age for registered dental assisting from seventeen to eighteen years of age.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateREFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
2019-05-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-14Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-09Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.291
2019-05-07Assemblyreported
2019-01-31Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S04558 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback