NY A04061 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to defining the terms "retiree" and "beneficiary" within the freedom of information law.
Title
Relates to defining the terms "retiree" and "beneficiary" within the freedom of information law.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Englebright [D] | Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D] | Asm. Deborah Glick [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] |
Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.159 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-03-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.80 |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07021 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS