NY A04022 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-3)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - print number 4022b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - print number 4022b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a working families tax credit; directs quarterly prepayment of the credit; provides for a sliding reduction in the credit for incomes which exceed a certain threshold.
Title
Provides for a working families tax credit; directs quarterly prepayment of the credit; provides for a sliding reduction in the credit for incomes which exceed a certain threshold.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | print number 4022b |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | print number 4022a |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S00277 (Same As) 2024-02-27 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE