NY A04020 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-18 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-18 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits any person from attempting to or to in fact alter, deface, injure, knock down, cover, remove or otherwise interfere with any traffic control device or railroad sign or signal; provides an affirmative defense therefor that operator can show he or she was not aware of the device.
Title
Prohibits any person from attempting to or to in fact alter, deface, injure, knock down, cover, remove or otherwise interfere with any traffic control device or railroad sign or signal; provides an affirmative defense therefor that operator can show he or she was not aware of the device.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2012-04-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-04-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-04-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.429 |
2012-03-27 | Assembly | reported |
2012-01-31 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2011-02-15 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-02-01 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S02754 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION