NY A04014 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires hospitals to establish policies and procedures regarding domestic violence; establishes ongoing training programs on domestic violence for all current and new hospital employees; designates a hospital staff member to coordinate services to victims; provides for the interaction of hospitals with community domestic violence service providers in order to coordinate services to victims of domestic violence; requires hospitals to offer to contact a local advocate when admitting or treating a confirmed or suspected victim of domestic violence.
Title
Requires hospitals to establish policies and procedures regarding domestic violence; establishes ongoing training programs on domestic violence for all current and new hospital employees; designates a hospital staff member to coordinate services to victims; provides for the interaction of hospitals with community domestic violence service providers in order to coordinate services to victims of domestic violence; requires hospitals to offer to contact a local advocate when admitting or treating a confirmed or suspected victim of domestic violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4014a |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.306 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-02-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.81 |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S03589 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH