NY A04010 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the department of transportation to annually prepare and submit to the legislature certain highway pavement and bridge condition reports.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the department of transportation to annually prepare and submit to the legislature certain highway pavement and bridge condition reports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-06-10SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-06-10Senate3RD READING CAL.420
2021-06-10SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S199B
2021-06-08SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2021-06-08Assemblydelivered to senate
2021-06-08Assemblypassed assembly
2021-06-08Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.546
2021-06-08Assemblyrules report cal.546
2021-06-08Assemblyreported
2021-06-03Assemblyamend and recommit to rules 4010b
2021-05-26Assemblyreported referred to rules
2021-05-24Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2021-05-20Assemblyprint number 4010a
2021-05-20Assemblyamend and recommit to transportation
2021-02-01Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S00199 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4010B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A4010
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04010&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04010
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04010&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04010A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04010&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04010B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04010&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04010&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04010&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04010&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A4010#SF1

Bill Comments 750

feedback