NY A04007 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for coverage for certain medically necessary prescription drugs in Medicaid managed care programs.
Title
Provides for coverage for certain medically necessary prescription drugs in Medicaid managed care programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.982 |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06541 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH