NY A04002 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-28 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the suspension of hunting and fishing licenses pursuant to the interstate wildlife violator compact.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the suspension of hunting and fishing licenses pursuant to the interstate wildlife violator compact.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-28SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2014-04-28Assemblydelivered to senate
2014-04-28Assemblypassed assembly
2014-04-24Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.559
2014-04-07Assemblyreported
2014-04-01Assemblyreported referred to codes
2014-01-08Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2013-01-30Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S02794 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback