NY A03991 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a system for notifying customers of bed bug infestations on MTA subways, trains and buses, within 24 hours of discovering such infestation.
Title
Requires a system for notifying customers of bed bug infestations on MTA subways, trains and buses, within 24 hours of discovering such infestation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.113 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.113 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S09188 (Same As) 2022-05-12 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION