NY A03985 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the crime of staging a motor vehicle accident.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the crime of staging a motor vehicle accident.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-03SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-03Senate3RD READING CAL.805
2019-06-03SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2508
2019-05-06SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2019-05-06Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-06Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-02Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.241
2019-04-30Assemblyreported
2019-01-31Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S02508 (Same As) 2019-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3985

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback