NY A03984 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that individuals have the ability to vote by absentee ballot in certain elections where their maximum sentence of imprisonment has expired.
Title
Clarifies that individuals have the ability to vote by absentee ballot in certain elections where their maximum sentence of imprisonment has expired.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S07529 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES