NY A03974 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the office of temporary and disability assistance and the department of corrections and community supervision to examine and make recommendations on current sanctions placed by the state and local social services districts on individuals prior to and after their release from incarceration as part of the individual's re-entry planning.
Title
Directs the office of temporary and disability assistance and the department of corrections and community supervision to examine and make recommendations on current sanctions placed by the state and local social services districts on individuals prior to and after their release from incarceration as part of the individual's re-entry planning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.302 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.514 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S01056 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION