NY A03972 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.157
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.157
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to unlawful discriminatory practices; requires employers to make a conditional offer of employment before inquiring about any criminal convictions of a prospective employee.
Title
Relates to unlawful discriminatory practices; requires employers to make a conditional offer of employment before inquiring about any criminal convictions of a prospective employee.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. Harry Bronson [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.157 |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.290 |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S01402 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS