NY A03970 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the county health commissioner to notify certain individuals in the event of an emergency creating an imminent risk to public health and safety.
Title
Requires the county health commissioner to notify certain individuals in the event of an emergency creating an imminent risk to public health and safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 107 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2022-03-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.135 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.128 |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-29 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01140 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO HEALTH