NY A03960 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-6)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a small business tax credit for the employment of disabled persons.
Title
Establishes a small business tax credit for the employment of disabled persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-03-08 | Assembly | amended on third reading 3960a |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.134 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.357 |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-29 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03458 (Same As) 2022-03-09 - PRINT NUMBER 3458A