NY A03939 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-26 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-26 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring a particularized and specific justification for denial of access to records under the freedom of information law, exemption from disclosure under the freedom of information law of certain law enforcement related records and to records identifying victims.
Title
Relates to requiring a particularized and specific justification for denial of access to records under the freedom of information law, exemption from disclosure under the freedom of information law of certain law enforcement related records and to records identifying victims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-26 | Senate | tabled |
2019-12-26 | Senate | vetoed memo.252 |
2019-12-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.654 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5496 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.112 |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S05496 (Same As) 2019-12-26 - tabled