NY A03939 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to requiring a particularized and specific justification for denial of access to records under the freedom of information law, exemption from disclosure under the freedom of information law of certain law enforcement related records and to records identifying victims.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to requiring a particularized and specific justification for denial of access to records under the freedom of information law, exemption from disclosure under the freedom of information law of certain law enforcement related records and to records identifying victims.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2019-03-12Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-03-12Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-07Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.112
2019-03-05Assemblyreported
2019-02-27Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-31Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S05496 (Same As) 2019-05-15 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback