NY A03936 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - signed chap.295
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - signed chap.295
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the crime victims board to accept other official documents in lieu of police reports for documentation of eligibility for compensation for rape, sexual assault and child abuse and domestic violence.
Title
Authorizes the crime victims board to accept other official documents in lieu of police reports for documentation of eligibility for compensation for rape, sexual assault and child abuse and domestic violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 116 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 116 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-01 | Senate | signed chap.295 |
2018-09-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-12 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-12 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1737 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8751 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.299 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.205 |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | reported |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S08751 (Same As) 2018-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3936