NY A03922 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - substituted by s598b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - substituted by s598b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "reimagining long-term care task force act" to create a task force to study the state of long-term care services in this state.
Title
Enacts the "reimagining long-term care task force act" to create a task force to study the state of long-term care services in this state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Aging Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Aging Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | Assembly | substituted by s598b |
2021-03-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.25 |
2021-03-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.25 |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | print number 3922a |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to aging |
2021-01-29 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S00598 (Same As) 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.120