NY A03918 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-12)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows a prescription for a schedule II, III or IV controlled substance to be partially filled at the request of the prescriber or patient.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows a prescription for a schedule II, III or IV controlled substance to be partially filled at the request of the prescriber or patient.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2019-05-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-14Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-09Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.289
2019-05-07Assemblyreported
2019-01-31Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S01813 (Same As) 2019-01-16 - REFERRED TO HEALTH

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback