NY A03917 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the cumulative grade point average admission requirement for graduate-level teacher and educational leader programs.
Title
Relates to the cumulative grade point average admission requirement for graduate-level teacher and educational leader programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.295 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.509 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | referred to higher education |