NY A03915 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-6)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.294
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.294
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires law enforcement agencies to report sex offender changes of address within five business days to the division of criminal justice services.
Title
Requires law enforcement agencies to report sex offender changes of address within five business days to the division of criminal justice services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.294 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.215 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.215 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | print number 3915a |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to correction |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S03037 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES