NY A03913 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires employers to display a poster containing information on veterans' benefits and services which shall be created and distributed by the department of labor for display by employers with more than fifty full-time equivalent employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires employers to display a poster containing information on veterans' benefits and services which shall be created and distributed by the department of labor for display by employers with more than fifty full-time equivalent employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-25SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2022-05-25SenatePASSED SENATE
2022-05-25Senate3RD READING CAL.1204
2022-05-25SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1961B
2022-02-09SenateREFERRED TO LABOR
2022-02-09Assemblydelivered to senate
2022-02-09Assemblypassed assembly
2022-01-31Assemblyamended on third reading 3913b
2022-01-05Assemblyordered to third reading cal.132
2022-01-05SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2022-01-05SenateDIED IN SENATE
2021-05-19SenateREFERRED TO LABOR
2021-05-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2021-05-19Assemblypassed assembly
2021-05-13Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.356
2021-05-11Assemblyreported
2021-04-28Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2021-04-20Assemblyprint number 3913a
2021-04-20Assemblyamend and recommit to labor
2021-01-28Assemblyreferred to labor

Same As/Similar To

S01961 (Same As) 2022-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3913B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A3913
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03913&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03913
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03913&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03913A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03913&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03913B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03913&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03913&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03913&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A3913#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback