NY A03891 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-13)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - substituted by s3086
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - substituted by s3086
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the age of consent for purposes of marriage to the age of eighteen.
Title
Increases the age of consent for purposes of marriage to the age of eighteen.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Assembly | substituted by s3086 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.305 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S03086 (Same As) 2021-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.306