NY A03888 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-14 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-14 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires fiscal impact notes on bills affecting political subdivisions including identifying a source of funding for the annual cost of the legislation.
Title
Requires fiscal impact notes on bills affecting political subdivisions including identifying a source of funding for the annual cost of the legislation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental operations |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | motion to discharge lost |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S00911 (Same As) 2018-01-23 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE