NY A03885 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-05 - print number 3885a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-05 - print number 3885a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the salaries of certain teachers and aids employed by boards of cooperative educational services.
Title
Relates to the salaries of certain teachers and aids employed by boards of cooperative educational services.
Sponsors
Asm. Catherine Nolan [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. Harry Bronson [D] |
Asm. Carrie Woerner [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Assembly | print number 3885a |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to education |
2015-01-28 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S03697 (Same As) 2016-02-22 - PRINT NUMBER 3697A