NY A03876 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 80-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the New York state climate leadership and community protection act; relates to climate change; renewable energy program; labor and job standards and worker protection.
Title
Enacts the New York state climate leadership and community protection act; relates to climate change; renewable energy program; labor and job standards and worker protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | print number 3876b |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to rules |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 3876a |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S02992 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION