NY A03866 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.102
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.102
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires entities responsible for the provision of vital services to coordinate and work expeditiously to restore service whenever such service is interrupted; includes gas as a vital service.
Title
Requires entities responsible for the provision of vital services to coordinate and work expeditiously to restore service whenever such service is interrupted; includes gas as a vital service.
Sponsors
Asm. Chantel Jackson [D] | Asm. Grace Lee [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.102 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2023-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.148 |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.148 |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | print number 3866a |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2023-02-08 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S00220 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT