NY A03864 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-10 - print number 3864a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-10 - print number 3864a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires automobiles sold in this state with model year 2024 and thereafter to be equipped with a blind spot monitoring device.
Title
Requires automobiles sold in this state with model year 2024 and thereafter to be equipped with a blind spot monitoring device.
Sponsors
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Assembly | print number 3864a |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S08383 (Same As) 2018-05-11 - PRINT NUMBER 8383A