NY A03853 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - advanced to third reading cal.637
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - advanced to third reading cal.637
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Individuals nominated to serve on the committee to receive notices, shall, in a certificate signed and acknowledged by him or her, accept the nomination to the committee, otherwise such nomination shall be null and void.
Title
Individuals nominated to serve on the committee to receive notices, shall, in a certificate signed and acknowledged by him or her, accept the nomination to the committee, otherwise such nomination shall be null and void.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.637 |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | print number 3853a |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | referred to election law |