NY A03843 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the young adult voter registration act; requires each public high school within the state to make voter registration forms available to all students.
Title
Enacts the young adult voter registration act; requires each public high school within the state to make voter registration forms available to all students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.291 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | amended on third reading 3843a |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.337 |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S04112 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS