NY A03805 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-3)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - substituted by s3521a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - substituted by s3521a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands customer access to community distributed generation by creating a model tariff to provide for the transfer of bill credits associated with electricity produced by community distributed generation facilities in one electric corporation territory to other territories.
Title
Expands customer access to community distributed generation by creating a model tariff to provide for the transfer of bill credits associated with electricity produced by community distributed generation facilities in one electric corporation territory to other territories.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Assembly | substituted by s3521a |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.306 |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | print number 3805a |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to energy |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S03521 (Same As) 2021-12-29 - VETOED MEMO.75