NY A03778 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - substituted by s521
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to voting by members of the New York state authorities control board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to voting by members of the New York state authorities control board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-17Assemblysubstituted by s521
2023-03-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.108
2023-03-28Assemblyreported
2023-03-21Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2023-02-08Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S00521 (Same As) 2023-11-17 - VETOED MEMO.65

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback