NY A03770 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-15 - substituted by s1348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to notification changes to the model contract with managed care providers under the medical assistance program; requires the department to post on its website certain changes required to be submitted to the centers for medicare and medicaid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to notification changes to the model contract with managed care providers under the medical assistance program; requires the department to post on its website certain changes required to be submitted to the centers for medicare and medicaid.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-15Assemblysubstituted by s1348
2023-02-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.99
2023-02-14Assemblyrules report cal.99
2023-02-14Assemblyreported
2023-02-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-02-07Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S01348 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - SIGNED CHAP.100

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback