NY A03768 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - signed chap.691
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - signed chap.691
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to net energy metering for fuel-flexible linear generator electric generating equipment.
Title
Relates to net energy metering for fuel-flexible linear generator electric generating equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-16 | Assembly | signed chap.691 |
2022-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-05 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.920 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8327A |
2022-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2022-03-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.130 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.305 |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | print number 3768a |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to energy |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S01163 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - AMENDED BY RESTORING TO PREVIOUS PRINT 1163A
S08327 (Same As) 2022-05-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3768A
S08327 (Same As) 2022-05-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3768A