NY A03752 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-3)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - print number 3752a
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a system for notifying customers of bed bug infestations on MTA subways, trains and buses, within 24 hours of discovering such infestation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires a system for notifying customers of bed bug infestations on MTA subways, trains and buses, within 24 hours of discovering such infestation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-14Assemblyprint number 3752a
2018-03-14Assemblyamend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions
2017-01-30Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S07936 (Same As) 2018-03-12 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback