NY A03729 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.283
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.283
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the manufacture, transport, shipment or possession of an undetectable knife.
Title
Prohibits the manufacture, transport, shipment or possession of an undetectable knife.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.283 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-03-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.107 |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S08475 (Same As) 2018-05-08 - REFERRED TO CODES