NY A03702 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - substituted by s870c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - substituted by s870c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Buffalo to provide by local law for the adjudication of traffic infractions.
Title
Authorizes the city of Buffalo to provide by local law for the adjudication of traffic infractions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s870c |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.537 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-05-20 | Assembly | print number 3702c |
2014-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2013-11-18 | Assembly | print number 3702b |
2013-11-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2013-04-19 | Assembly | print number 3702a |
2013-04-19 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2013-01-28 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S00870 (Same As) 2014-12-30 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR