NY A03697 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions of law relating to the sale of municipal notes and bonds of the county of Erie.
Title
Extends provisions of law relating to the sale of municipal notes and bonds of the county of Erie.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.74 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-04 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-04 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-04 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.497 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | substituted for a3697 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.569 |
2019-03-01 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | substituted by s4159 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.497 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-30 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S04159 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.74