NY A03696 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-26 - advanced to third reading cal.759
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits insurers from refusing to issue or renew, cancel, charge or impose an increased premium for homeowners' insurance policies based on the breed of a dog owned.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits insurers from refusing to issue or renew, cancel, charge or impose an increased premium for homeowners' insurance policies based on the breed of a dog owned.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-26Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.759
2016-05-24Assemblyreported
2016-05-18Assemblyreported referred to codes
2016-01-06Assemblyreferred to insurance
2015-01-27Assemblyreferred to insurance

Same As/Similar To

S00487 (Same As) 0000-00-00 -

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback