NY A03675 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 70-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - signed chap.37
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 70-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - signed chap.37
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the department of motor vehicles to issue standard drivers' licenses and restricts what information can be retained and given out on those applying or holding standard drivers' licenses.
Title
Authorizes the department of motor vehicles to issue standard drivers' licenses and restricts what information can be retained and given out on those applying or holding standard drivers' licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | signed chap.37 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1466 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1747B |
2019-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.118 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.118 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-08 | Assembly | print number 3675b |
2019-06-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | print number 3675a |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2019-01-30 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S01747 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - signed chap.37