NY A03661 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-3)
Status: Passed on September 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-13 - approval memo.22
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to afford all students an environment free of any harassment that substantially interferes with their education, regardless of the basis of the harass- ment, and free of discrimination based on actual or perceived race, color, weight, national origin, ethnic group, religion, disability, sexual orientation, gender, or sex.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "Dignity For All Students Act"; authorizes the commissioner of education to establish policies and procedures affording all students in public schools an environment free of harassment and discrimination; requires reporting harassment and discrimination to such commission; makes exemptions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-09-13 approval memo.22
2010-09-13 signed chap.482
2010-09-07 delivered to governor
2010-06-22 RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2010-06-22 PASSED SENATE
2010-06-22 MOTION TO AMEND LOST
2010-06-22 3RD READING CAL.1070
2010-06-22 SUBSTITUTED FOR S1987B
2010-05-17 REFERRED TO EDUCATION
2010-05-17 delivered to senate
2010-05-17 passed assembly
2010-02-08 amended on third reading 3661c
2010-01-06 ordered to third reading cal.275
2010-01-06 RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2010-01-06 DIED IN SENATE
2009-04-07 REFERRED TO EDUCATION
2009-04-07 delivered to senate
2009-04-07 passed assembly
2009-04-02 advanced to third reading cal.284
2009-03-31 reported
2009-03-16 print number 3661b
2009-03-16 amend and recommit to codes
2009-02-20 print number 3661a
2009-02-20 amend and recommit to codes
2009-02-04 reported referred to codes
2009-01-28 referred to education

Same As/Similar To

S1987-B (Same As) 2010-06-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3661C

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback