NY A03658 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.150
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.150
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definition of freshwater wetlands; repeals section relating to the applicability of the freshwater wetlands article; provides authority of DEC over wetlands which are one acre or more; amends permitting requirements for subdivision of land.
Title
Relates to the definition of freshwater wetlands; repeals section relating to the applicability of the freshwater wetlands article; provides authority of DEC over wetlands which are one acre or more; amends permitting requirements for subdivision of land.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.150 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.254 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.254 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-30 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S05576 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S07366 (Same As) 2020-01-22 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
S07366 (Same As) 2020-01-22 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION