NY A03653 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires motor vehicle sales and lease contract terms be written in the language in which such contracts were negotiated; requires retail motor vehicle dealers who negotiate primarily in languages other than English deliver to consumers a translation of such contracts in the language in which such contracts were negotiated; provides remedies to aggrieved consumers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires motor vehicle sales and lease contract terms be written in the language in which such contracts were negotiated; requires retail motor vehicle dealers who negotiate primarily in languages other than English deliver to consumers a translation of such contracts in the language in which such contracts were negotiated; provides remedies to aggrieved consumers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-04Assemblyenacting clause stricken
2012-01-04Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection
2011-03-03Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.90
2011-03-01Assemblyreported
2011-02-15Assemblyreported referred to codes
2011-01-26Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection

Same As/Similar To

S00900 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback