NY A03647 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that any claimant who has received certain unemployment benefits to which they were not entitled shall not be held liable for the amounts overpaid provided certain conditions exist.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that any claimant who has received certain unemployment benefits to which they were not entitled shall not be held liable for the amounts overpaid provided certain conditions exist.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-10Assemblyenacting clause stricken
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to labor
2023-02-03Assemblyreferred to labor

Same As/Similar To

S00549 (Same As) 2024-06-03 - PRINT NUMBER 549C

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback