NY A03642 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - substituted by s559
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - substituted by s559
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of health to request guidance from the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services to determine whether the state can claim federal financial participation for coverage of and payment for certain prescription digital therapeutics.
Title
Directs the department of health to request guidance from the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services to determine whether the state can claim federal financial participation for coverage of and payment for certain prescription digital therapeutics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Assembly | substituted by s559 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | rules report cal.445 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S00559 (Same As) 2022-12-30 - APPROVAL MEMO.102